| Change of Company Secretary | |
| | |
|
Microsoft Word - 20150630 Change of Company Secretary
ASX ANNOUNCEMENT 1 July 2015
Change of Company Secretary
Marmota Energy Limited (ASX:MEU) advises that effective 30 June 2015 Ms Virginia Suttell has ceased to be Company Secretary of the Company. Mr David Williams, the Company's Managing Director, has additionally been appointed Company Secretary of the Company.
For further information, please contact:
Marmota Energy Limited
David Williams Managing Director
Email: [email protected]
Level 30, Westpac House
91 King William Street
Adelaide SA 5000
ABN: 38 119 270 816
T: (61 8) 7088 4883
F: (61 8) 7088 4884 www.marmotaenergy.com.au
|
|
|
Marmota Energy Limited
|
|
EXPLORATION STAGE |
CODE : MEU.AX |
|
|
| |
ProfileMarket IndicatorsVALUE : Projects & res.Press releasesAnnual reportRISK : Asset profileContact Cpy |
Marmota Energy is a uranium exploration company based in Australia. Marmota Energy holds various exploration projects in Australia. Its main exploration properties are ANGEL WING in USA and WADDIKEE, EUREKA BLUFF, MELTON, MULYUNGARIE, AMBROSIA-MULGATHING and SOUTHERN EYRE PENINSULA in Australia. Marmota Energy is listed in Australia. Its market capitalisation is AU$ 20.2 millions as of today (US$ 13.6 millions, € 12.2 millions). Its stock quote reached its highest recent level on September 21, 2012 at AU$ 0.28, and its lowest recent point on July 03, 2015 at AU$ 0.01. Marmota Energy has 516 719 968 shares outstanding. |